07/07/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 60, Statutes of 2010. | |||
07/07/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | |||
07/01/2010 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 5933.) | |||
06/28/2010 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
06/28/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4090.) | |||
06/15/2010 | Amended. To third reading. | |||
06/14/2010 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 10). | |||
04/15/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
09/09/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
09/08/2009 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 3109.) | |||
08/24/2009 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 18). | |||
08/17/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. | |||
04/23/2009 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/21/2009 | From printer. | |||
04/20/2009 | Introduced. To print. |