09/16/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 104, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/16/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. | |||
09/03/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
09/02/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 1. Page 2104.) | |||
08/26/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 26). | |||
08/19/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
06/26/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
06/25/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 2257.) | |||
06/24/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 23). | |||
05/11/2009 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
05/06/2009 | From printer. | |||
05/05/2009 | Introduced. To print. |