09/07/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/07/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | |||
08/23/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/23/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4763.) | |||
06/16/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 15). | |||
05/20/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
09/01/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/31/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 29. Page 2811.) | |||
08/25/2009 | Amended. To third reading. | |||
08/24/2009 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 18). | |||
05/26/2009 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/19/2009 | From printer. | |||
05/18/2009 | Introduced. To print. |