06/16/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 51, Statutes of 2009. | |||
06/16/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
06/11/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
06/11/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0.) | |||
06/09/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |||
05/14/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/06/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/04/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1218.) | |||
04/23/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 22). | |||
03/27/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
03/26/2009 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Amended. | |||
01/23/2009 | From printer. | |||
01/22/2009 | Introduced. To print. |