08/30/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/30/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |||
08/18/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/18/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4578.) | |||
08/04/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
05/25/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/24/2010 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5273.) | |||
02/23/2010 | Amended. To third reading. | |||
02/22/2010 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 16). | |||
01/04/2010 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
08/28/2009 | From printer. | |||
08/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |