08/30/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/30/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |||
08/18/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/18/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4590.) | |||
06/15/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 14). | |||
06/09/2010 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 9). | |||
02/11/2010 | Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ. | |||
01/26/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
01/25/2010 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 19. Page 3865.) | |||
01/14/2010 | Amended. To third reading. | |||
01/13/2010 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (January 11). | |||
09/10/2009 | From printer. Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
09/09/2009 | Introduced. To print. |