|
09/09/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 145, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2010
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 6717.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4831.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 9).
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 5745.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Amended.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2009
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|