|
08/23/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 60. Noes 11. Page 6080.) (Corrected August 16.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4196.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 8. Page 4798.)
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Amended.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
01/22/2010
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|