|
08/18/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Lowenthal.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 25. Page 980.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Amended.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2009
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|