|
07/07/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2010
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 15. Page 5934.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4098.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 10).
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 5. Page 4549.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|