LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AJR33
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AJR33
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AJR33
Action History
04/22/2010
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
04/22/2010
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4794.)
04/15/2010
Amended. To third reading.
04/14/2010
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 12).
03/04/2010
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
02/18/2010
From printer.
02/17/2010
Introduced. To print.