06/28/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 42, Statutes of 2010. | |||
06/28/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:40 p.m. | |||
06/24/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
06/24/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. To Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4058.) | |||
05/10/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/10/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5088.) | |||
05/05/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (May 4). | |||
04/12/2010 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/06/2010 | From printer. | |||
04/05/2010 | Introduced. To print. |