08/17/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 92, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/17/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
08/11/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/11/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4457.) | |||
06/30/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
06/28/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
06/24/2010 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5807.) | |||
06/21/2010 | From Consent Calendar. To third reading. | |||
06/16/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (June 15). | |||
06/03/2010 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
06/01/2010 | From printer. | |||
05/28/2010 | Introduced. To print. |