09/14/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 165, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/14/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |||
08/30/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/30/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4993.) | |||
08/20/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
07/01/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
07/01/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 19. Page 5927.) | |||
06/29/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 28). | |||
06/10/2010 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | |||
06/08/2010 | From printer. | |||
06/07/2010 | Introduced. To print. |