09/14/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 166, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/14/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |||
08/30/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/30/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 5003.) | |||
08/25/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/17/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/17/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 6289.) | |||
08/16/2010 | Amended. To third reading. | |||
08/12/2010 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11). | |||
08/05/2010 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
06/30/2010 | From printer. | |||
06/29/2010 | Introduced. To print. |