LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AJR47
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AJR47
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AJR47
Action History
08/31/2010
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
08/30/2010
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6867.)
08/26/2010
Referred to Com. on RULES. From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (August 26).
08/18/2010
From printer. (Corrected August 27.)
08/17/2010
Introduced. To print.