09/01/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 92, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/01/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
08/25/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/24/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1916.) | |||
06/25/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
04/02/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/02/2009 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 12. Page 756.) | |||
04/01/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 31). | |||
02/26/2009 | Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. | |||
02/19/2009 | From printer. | |||
02/18/2009 | Introduced. To print. |