|
09/08/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 94, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 62. Noes 4. Page 2787.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1975.)
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Adopted and to Senate. Action rescinded and record expunged whereby a final roll call vote was taken. Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 3. Page 983.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|