LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
HR11
Action History
CA
California House Bill HR11
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California House Bill HR11
Action History
08/31/2009
Read and adopted. (Page 2810.).
08/20/2009
Amended. To third reading.
04/15/2009
From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14).
03/23/2009
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
03/04/2009
Introduced.