LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
HR23
Action History
CA
California House Bill HR23
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California House Bill HR23
Action History
05/03/2010
Read and adopted. (Page 4979.).
04/28/2010
From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 27).
03/23/2010
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
03/11/2010
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
03/10/2010
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Amended.
02/18/2010
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
02/08/2010
Introduced.