LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
HR31
Action History
CA
California House Bill HR31
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California House Bill HR31
Action History
08/16/2010
Read and adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6228.).
08/09/2010
Amended. To third reading.
06/30/2010
From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 29).
06/22/2010
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
06/21/2010
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Amended.
06/17/2010
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
06/10/2010
Introduced.