08/23/2010 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.) Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
08/20/2010 | Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6432.) To third reading. (August 20 amended measure version corrected August 25.) | |||
07/01/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/30/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |||
06/22/2010 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/16/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
06/15/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/13/2010 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/26/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/26/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3323.) To Assembly. | |||
04/20/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
04/19/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3165.) | |||
04/06/2010 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
02/11/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 13. | |||
02/10/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |