|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment. (Enrolled measure version corrected August 25.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2675.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar. Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on April 15.)
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 286.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 254.)
|
|
|
|
02/09/2009
|
Set for hearing March 4.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|