08/02/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. (August 2 amended measure version corrected August 3.) | |||
06/10/2010 | To Com. on BUDGET. | |||
06/02/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/02/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3730.) To Assembly. | |||
06/01/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/28/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3676.) | |||
05/26/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. | |||
05/25/2010 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3606.) | |||
04/22/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
04/12/2010 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |||
04/08/2010 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
02/25/2010 | To Com. on B. & F.R. | |||
02/12/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 14. | |||
02/11/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |