|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 6. Page 3652.) To Assembly. Motion to reconsider made by Senator Yee. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3654.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 8. Page 3655.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing April 22. (For vote only.) From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3294.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3038.)
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Set for hearing April 12 in B., P. & E.D. pending receipt.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|