|
06/29/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3743.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3670.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2010
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3293.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|