|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 635, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2010
|
To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Correctly enrolled. Held at Desk pursuant to Joint Rule 57.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4648.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6178.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3475.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3308.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3001.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Coms. on N.R. & W. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|