|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 485, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4909.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6494.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in Committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 6. Page 3651.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3497.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3184.)
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3102.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2010
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|