06/28/2010 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | |||
06/03/2010 | To Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/28/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/28/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 7. Page 3659.) To Assembly. | |||
05/13/2010 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 11. Page 3521.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Cedillo. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3521.) | |||
04/27/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/26/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
04/22/2010 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
04/20/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/19/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3185.) | |||
04/06/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
03/24/2010 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
02/16/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | |||
02/12/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |