|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 331, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 17. Page 2387.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 34. Page 3112.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3037.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on July 15.)
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 1114.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 677.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
To Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|