06/22/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/15/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
05/13/2010 | To Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
04/29/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/29/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3379.) To Assembly. | |||
04/26/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
04/22/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3295.) | |||
04/08/2010 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/25/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/17/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |||
02/16/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |