California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1055 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2010

Amended

Bill August 2, 2010
Bill July 1, 2010
Bill April 21, 2010