|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 511, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6178.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3796.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3616.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3187.)
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Coms. on V.A. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|