|
09/28/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 408, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4947.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6362.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3278.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended and placed on Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3002.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|