LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1060
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1060
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1060
Action History
05/03/2010
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
04/06/2010
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3085.)
03/17/2010
Set for hearing April 6.
02/25/2010
To Com. on PUB. S.
02/17/2010
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
02/16/2010
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.