|
08/13/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 21.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 3699.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3670.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3038.)
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|