|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 512, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4946.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6332.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69 (d) suspended. (Page 6303.)
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6261.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
To Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3478.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3304.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3145.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|