06/16/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/02/2010 | Set for hearing June 16. (For vote only.) | |||
05/05/2010 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 5. Page 3466.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/28/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing May 5. | |||
04/15/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and REV. & TAX. | |||
04/12/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/07/2010 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
04/05/2010 | Re-referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and HEALTH. | |||
03/24/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/25/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/18/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |