|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.) Re-referred to Com. On G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6437.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
To Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3412.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3357.)
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|