05/13/2010 | Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
05/03/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
04/23/2010 | Set for hearing May 12. | |||
04/22/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/20/2010 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
02/25/2010 | To Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/18/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |