|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 284, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4649.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6179.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Coms. on V.A. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3585.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3547.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3295.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on ED. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3187.) Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Coms. on V.A. and ED.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|