|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 319, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 8. Page 4882.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 5. Page 6296.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 7. Page 3625.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3185.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|