California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1079 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/29/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1079CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 513 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 29, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 29, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 26, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 16, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 3, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 3, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 5, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Walters FEBRUARY 17, 2010 An act to amend Section 14851 of the Government Code, relating to advertising. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1079, Walters. Office of State Printing: paid advertisements: authorization. Existing law authorizes the Office of State Printing, also known as the Office of State Publishing, to accept paid advertisements in materials printed or published by the state, except for paid political advertising. This bill would specifically authorize the office to allow paid advertisements, except for paid political advertising, in materials printed or published by a state agency or vendor. The bill would also provide that funds derived from the paid advertisements be available to the agency, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to fund agency operations. The bill would prohibit the office from accepting or authorizing any paid advertisements in materials printed or published for the Secretary of State. The bill would require the office to receive written consent, as specified, in order to apply these provisions to an executive branch agency administered by a constitutional officer other than the Governor. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14851 of the Government Code is amended to read: 14851. (a) Except as provided in subdivision (e) or (f), the Office of State Publishing may accept or authorize paid advertisements in materials printed or published by the office, a state agency, or a vendor, except that the office shall not print, publish, or authorize paid political advertising. (b) The Office of State Publishing may print checks and other printed matter necessary for the operation of any industry board or state agricultural district board at the expense of the state. (c) To reduce duplication of staff resources and to provide consistency in the review for appropriateness of advertisements, an agency of the state that was not authorized to accept paid advertising in its publications before January 1, 2006, shall use the services of the Office of State Publishing for all paid advertising in its publications. (d) Funds derived from the placement of paid advertisements on agency literature or publications pursuant to this section shall be available to the agency, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to fund agency operations. (e) The Office of State Publishing shall not accept or authorize any paid advertisements in materials printed or published for the Secretary of State. (f) The authorization provided in subdivision (a) to the Office of State Publishing shall apply to materials printed or published for an executive branch agency administered by a constitutional officer other than the Governor only upon the written consent of the director of the agency or his or her designee. The director or his or her designee may revoke this consent at any time in a writing appropriately delivered to the Office of State Publishing.