06/25/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/22/2009 | To Coms. on JUD. and ED. | |||
06/03/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/03/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1173.) To Assembly. | |||
06/01/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1025.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/19/2009 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/12/2009 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/08/2009 | Set for hearing May 18. | |||
05/06/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/01/2009 | Set for hearing May 11. | |||
04/29/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 701.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/21/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/14/2009 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
03/26/2009 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
02/05/2009 | To Com. on JUD. | |||
01/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 27. | |||
01/27/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |