|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 711, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 26. Noes 0. Page 4971.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6743.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6644.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6607.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Placed on third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6003.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3193.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3085.)
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|