09/29/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 514, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/29/2010 | Approved by Governor. | |||
09/02/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m. | |||
08/19/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4679.) To enrollment. | |||
08/18/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
08/18/2010 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6335.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6336.) To Senate. | |||
08/17/2010 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 6302.) To third reading. | |||
06/21/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/17/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Heard in Committee on June 16.) | |||
05/13/2010 | To Com. on G.O. | |||
04/08/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/08/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3118.) To Assembly. | |||
04/06/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To Consent Calendar. | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3001.) | |||
03/11/2010 | Set for hearing March 23. | |||
02/18/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |