|
09/29/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4921.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6506.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6429.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3742.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3671.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3303.)
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|