|
08/31/2010
|
Senate refuses to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 14. Noes 7. Page 5063.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Florez. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5063.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 4985.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Set for hearing August 27.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4858.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6540.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6441.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 3693.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3498.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3163.)
|
|
|
|
04/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|