05/27/2010 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/17/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
05/11/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/07/2010 | Set for hearing May 17. | |||
05/03/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/30/2010 | Set for hearing May 10. | |||
04/27/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/26/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3298.) | |||
03/23/2010 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
02/25/2010 | To Com. on E., U., & C. | |||
02/18/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |