05/27/2010 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/11/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/10/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/30/2010 | Set for hearing May 10. | |||
04/22/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3295.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/15/2010 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
04/14/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on ED. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3162.) Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |||
04/01/2010 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
02/25/2010 | To Coms. on HUMAN S. and ED. | |||
02/18/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |